SC S0463 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Act No. 126
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Act No. 126
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
Direct The Department Of Natural Resources To Conduct A Review Of Wildlife Tagging, Validation, And Methods Of Checking Harvested Game Utilized In Other States And To Report Its Findings And Recommendations
Title
Department of Natural Resources
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-17 | Act No. 126 | |
2015-06-04 | Effective date 06/01/15 | |
2015-06-01 | Signed By Governor | |
2015-05-28 | Ratified R 55 | |
2015-05-15 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2015-05-14 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2015-05-14 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2015-05-14 | House | Read second time |
2015-05-13 | House | Recalled from Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-17 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-1 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |