SC S0379 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Chapter 89, Title 44 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Birthing Center Licensure Act, By Adding Article 3, To Provide That The Department Of Health And Environmental Control Shall Promulgate Regulations To Integrate Birthing Centers And Licensed Midwives Into Perinatal Care Services, And To Define Necessary Terms.
Title
Perinatal care services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2021-04-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |