SC S0369 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 48-39-290(b)(2)(a) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Prohibition On Erosion Control Structures Or Devices Seaward Of The Setback Line, To Allow For Shoreline-perpendicular Wingwalls That Extend Landward From The Ends Of Existing Erosion Control Structures Or Devices.
Title
Erosion control structures or devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3700 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Veto sustained Yeas-60 Nays-43
H4811 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Act No. 129
H4945 (Similar To) 2020-10-07 - Act No. 178
H4811 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Act No. 129
H4945 (Similar To) 2020-10-07 - Act No. 178
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0369&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/369_20190115.htm |