SC H4811 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Act No. 129
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Act No. 129
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 48-39-290, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Prohibition On Erosion Control Structures Or Devices Seaward Of The Setback Line, So As To Allow For The Placement Of Shoreline Perpendicular Wingwalls That Extend Landward From The Ends Of Existing Erosion Control Structures Or Devices. - Ratified Title
Title
Erosion control structures or devices
Sponsors
Rep. William Bailey [R] | Rep. William Hewitt [R] | Rep. Kevin Hardee [R] | Rep. Alan Clemmons [R] |
Rep. Cally Forrest [R] | Rep. William Hixon [R] | Rep. Randy Ligon [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Act No. 129 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date 03/24/20 | |
2020-03-24 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-03-19 | Ratified R 134 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-46 Nays-0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-01-22 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2020-01-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2020-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ligon |
2020-01-16 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon |
2020-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-12-11 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0369 (Similar To) 2019-01-15 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
H3700 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Veto sustained Yeas-60 Nays-43
H4945 (Similar To) 2020-10-07 - Act No. 178
H3700 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Veto sustained Yeas-60 Nays-43
H4945 (Similar To) 2020-10-07 - Act No. 178