SC H3700 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That A Permit Is Not Required To Undertake Actions Protecting Certain Existing Erosion Control Devices

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Erosion control structures or devices, prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Vetoed by Governor
2019-05-09 Ratified R 60
2019-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-34 Nays-3
2019-05-08SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2019-05-08HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-08HouseSenate amendment amended
2019-05-02SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-04-23SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2019-04-23SenateRead second time
2019-04-23SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-04-03 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-02SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-02-12HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-02-07HouseRoll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
2019-02-07HouseRead second time
2019-02-07HouseAmended
2019-02-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons
2019-02-05HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-30HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hardee
2019-01-22HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0369 (Similar To) 2019-01-15 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4839130(n/a)See Bill Text
4839290(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3700&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3700_20190122.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3700_20190205.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3700_20190207.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3700_20190402.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3700_20190403.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3700_20190423.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3700_20190508.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15629
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16546
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16767

Bill Comments

feedback