SC S0343 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulate The Clemson University Football Team And Coaches For Winning The 2018 College Football Playoff National Championship Title, To Recognize The Team's Numerous Accomplishments During The Season, To Invite The Number-one Ranked Tigers And Clemson Officials To Join The General Assembly In Joint Session At Noon On Tuesday, February 26, 2019, Whereby Coach Dabo Swinney Is Invited To Address The Joint Session, And To Extend The Privilege Of The Floor During The Joint Session.
Title
Clemson University Football Team
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Operations and Management |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Polled out of committee Operations and Management |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Operations and Management |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced |