SC S0300 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-24 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-24 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To Driver's Licenses, To Provide For Minors To Be Able To Apply For A Beginner's Permit, Instruction Permit, Or Driver's License Under The Authorization Of A Responsible Adult Willing To Assume The Obligation Imposed.
Title
Driver's license
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0198 (Similar To) 2017-04-17 - Act No. 2
H3242 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Member
H3322 (Similar To) 2017-03-07 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder
H3580 (Similar To) 2017-02-15 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott
H3242 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Member
H3322 (Similar To) 2017-03-07 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder
H3580 (Similar To) 2017-02-15 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0300&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/300_20170124.htm |