SC S0198 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Act No. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Act No. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Delete The Term "instruction Permit", And To Revise The List Of Persons Who Must Sign The Application Of An Unemancipated Minor
Title
Beginner's permit, instruction permit, or driver's license for minors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | Act No. 2 | |
2017-04-13 | Effective date 4/5/17 | |
2017-04-05 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-04-04 | Ratified R 8 | |
2017-03-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-83 Nays-0 |
2017-03-22 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2017-03-17 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2017-03-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-1 |
2017-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-07 | House | Amended |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-02-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-01-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0300 (Similar To) 2017-01-24 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
H3242 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Member
H3322 (Similar To) 2017-03-07 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder
H3580 (Similar To) 2017-02-15 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott
H3242 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Member
H3322 (Similar To) 2017-03-07 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder
H3580 (Similar To) 2017-02-15 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott