SC H3242 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-12 - Member
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-12 - Member
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That It Must Be Signed By A Person Responsible For An Unemancipated Minor's Welfare.
Title
Unemancipated minors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-12 | House | Member |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2016-12-15 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0198 (Similar To) 2017-04-17 - Act No. 2
S0300 (Similar To) 2017-01-24 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
H3322 (Similar To) 2017-03-07 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder
H3580 (Similar To) 2017-02-15 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott
S0300 (Similar To) 2017-01-24 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
H3322 (Similar To) 2017-03-07 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder
H3580 (Similar To) 2017-02-15 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3242&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3242_20161215.htm |