SC S0282 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Referred to Subcommittee: Young (ch), Sabb, Matthews, Garrett, M.Johnson
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Feb 25 @ 9:00 am in Gressette Room 105
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 42-1-160 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Injury And Personal Injury In Workers' Compensation, To Provide That A Limitation On Stress, Mental Injuries, And Mental Illness For Workers' Compensation Does Not Apply To A First Responder Diagnosed With Post-traumatic Stress Disorder, And To Define Necessary Terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' comp

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Young (ch), Sabb, Matthews, Garrett, M.Johnson
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0094 (Similar To) 2021-02-16 - Referred to Subcommittee: Young (ch), Sabb, Matthews, Garrett, M.Johnson
S0402 (Similar To) 2021-02-17 - Referred to Subcommittee: Young (ch), Sabb, Matthews, Garrett, M.Johnson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
421160(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback