SC S0252 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 53-3-215 So As To Designate The Month Of June Of Every Year As "salkehatchie Summer Service Month" In South Carolina.
Title
Salkehatchie Summer Service Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Family and Veterans' Services |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |