SC S0222 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 63-7-2320 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Kinship Foster Care Program, To Provide That Fictive Kin Are Eligible To Be Foster Parents Under The Kinship Foster Care Program, To Provide That Relatives And Fictive Kin May Foster A Child Before Being Licensed As A Kinship Foster Care Provider Under Certain Circumstances, And To Define Necessary Terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kinship foster care program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2021-02-17HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-02-16SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-02-11SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
2021-02-11SenateRead second time
2021-02-10SenateCommittee report: Favorable Family and Veterans' Services
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3214 (Similar To) 2021-02-24 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6372320(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback