SC S0201 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Chapter 18, Title 59 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Education Accountability Act, By Adding Article 16, To Provide Revised Accountability Measures For Public Schools And Public School Districts; And To Repeal Article 15, Chapter 18, Title 59 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Intervention And Assistance Under The Education Accountability Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number 8 (Y: 3 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-02-11 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-02-11SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-02-10SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-1
2021-02-10SenateRead second time
2021-02-10SenateAmended
2021-02-04SenateDebate interrupted
2021-02-03SenateDebate interrupted
2021-01-28SenateCommittee report: Favorable Education
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3610 (Similar To) 2021-02-24 - Referred to Committee on Education

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback