SC H3610 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 16 To Chapter 18, Title 59 So As To Provide Revised Accountability Measures For Public Schools And Public School Districts.
Title
Public schools
Sponsors
Rep. James Lucas [R] | Rep. Merita Allison [R] | Rep. Raye Felder [R] | Rep. William Hixon [R] |
Rep. Bill Taylor [R] | Rep. Paula Rawl Calhoon [R] | Rep. Weston Newton [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 91 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 15 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 20 N: 68 NV: 12 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 26 N: 68 NV: 12 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 25 N: 68 NV: 12 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Table Amendment 5 Amendment Number 5 (Y: 70 N: 25 NV: 11 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 19 N: 69 NV: 11 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Table Amendment 4 Amendment Number 4 (Y: 80 N: 29 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 77 N: 32 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 15 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 20 N: 68 NV: 12 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 26 N: 68 NV: 12 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 25 N: 68 NV: 12 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Table Amendment 5 Amendment Number 5 (Y: 70 N: 25 NV: 11 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 19 N: 69 NV: 11 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Table Amendment 4 Amendment Number 4 (Y: 80 N: 29 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 77 N: 32 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-02-23 | House | Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-18 |
2021-02-23 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-02-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-02-18 | House | Roll call Yeas-73 Nays-21 |
2021-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-18 | House | Amended |
2021-02-18 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton |
2021-02-17 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2021-02-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon, Taylor, Calhoon |
2021-02-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2021-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0201 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Act No. 44