SC S0032 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Define The Term "lap-shoulder Seat Belt"; And To Amend Section 59-67-40, Relating To The Applicability Of Certain Requirements Of Public School Buses To Private School Buses, So As Include Lap-shoulder Seat Belt Requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Buses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced and read first time
2016-12-13SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2016-12-13SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3027 (Similar To) 2017-03-23 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Whipper
H3061 (Similar To) 2017-03-29 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, Williams
H3945 (Similar To) 2017-04-19 - Recommitted to Committee on Education and Public Works

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
596710(n/a)See Bill Text
596740(n/a)See Bill Text
596775(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback