SC H3061 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, Williams
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, Williams
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Define The Term "lap-shoulder Seat Belt"; And To Amend Section 59-67-40, Relating To The Applicability Of Certain Requirements Of Public School Buses To Private School Buses, So As Include Lap-shoulder Seat Belt Requirements.
Title
School bus seat belts
Sponsors
Rep. Leola Robinson-Simpson [D] | Rep. Wendell Gilliard [D] | Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D] | Rep. Robert Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, Williams |
2017-01-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2016-12-15 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0032 (Similar To) 2017-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Education
H3027 (Similar To) 2017-03-23 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Whipper
H3945 (Similar To) 2017-04-19 - Recommitted to Committee on Education and Public Works
H3027 (Similar To) 2017-03-23 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Whipper
H3945 (Similar To) 2017-04-19 - Recommitted to Committee on Education and Public Works
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 67 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 67 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 67 | 75 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3061&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3061_20161215.htm |