SC H3027 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Whipper
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Define The Term "lap Seat Belt"; And To Amend Section 59-67-40, Relating To The Applicability Of Certain Requirements Of Public School Buses To Private School Buses, So As Include Lap Seat Belt Requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School bus safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Whipper
2017-01-12HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Robinson-Simpson
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2017-01-10HouseIntroduced and read first time
2016-12-15HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2016-12-15HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0032 (Similar To) 2017-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Education
H3061 (Similar To) 2017-03-29 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, Williams
H3945 (Similar To) 2017-04-19 - Recommitted to Committee on Education and Public Works

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
596710(n/a)See Bill Text
596740(n/a)See Bill Text
596775(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback