SC H5337 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Motor Vehicles, Relating To Driver Training Schools, Designated As Regulation Document Number 5105, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Department of Motor Vehicles - JR to Approve Regulation Document No. 5105
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
2022-05-06 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-05-05 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2022-05-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2022-05-05 | House | Read second time |
2022-05-03 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |