SC H5225 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 12-6-1180 So As To Allow An Income Tax Deduction For Each Clinical Rotation Served By A Physician, Advanced Practice Nurse, Or Physician Assistant As A Preceptor For Certain Programs.
Title
Preceptor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-29 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2024-03-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-12 |
2024-03-28 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-28 | House | Amended |
2024-03-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: King |
2024-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2024-03-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-03-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |