SC H5138 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Veto Continued
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Veto Continued
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Act 105 Of 2021, Relating To The Consolidation Of Barnwell County School Districts 29 And 19, So As To Provide That If The Term Of An Incumbent Member Of Either Of The Two Present Boards Expires During The Districts' Consolidation Transitional Period, Then The Barnwell County Legislative Delegation May Reappoint That Member For A Truncated Term To Expire On July 1, 2022. - Ratified Title
Title
Local Government - Barnwell County School District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | House | Veto Continued |
2022-04-13 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2022-04-07 | Ratified R 149 | |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2022-03-30 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-03-29 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2022-03-29 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-15 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
S1157 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Act No. 250
S1267 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Referred to Barnwell Delegation
S1267 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Referred to Barnwell Delegation