SC H5104 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - Read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - Read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Require All Testimony Given To A Committee Or Subcommittee Of The General Assembly Must Be Under Oath And To Create The Offenses Of Contempt Of The General Assembly And Criminal Contempt And Provide A Penalty For A Violation.
Title
Testimony given to a committee or subcommittee of General Assembly
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | Read second time | |
2012-05-30 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary | |
2012-04-27 | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Cleary, Scott | |
2012-04-25 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-25 | Introduced and read first time | |
2012-04-25 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2012-04-24 | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-1 | |
2012-04-24 | Read second time | |
2012-04-18 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-29 | Introduced and read first time |