SC H5059 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-08 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-08 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The State Board Of Education, Relating To Teacher Grants, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4409, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Teacher Grants (D. No. 4409)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-05-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-05-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2014-05-06 | House | Read second time |
2014-04-10 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-6-14 |
2014-04-03 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
S1265 (Similar To) 2014-05-15 - Recommitted to Committee on Education