SC H5051 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-19 - Act No. 213
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-19 - Act No. 213
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allow A Four Year College Or University, With Approval Of The Commission On Higher Education, To Offer A Doctoral Degree In Marine Science
Title
Higher Education mission and goals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Act No. 213 | |
2012-06-18 | Effective date 06/07/12 | |
2012-06-07 | Signed By Governor | |
2012-06-05 | Ratified R 243 | |
2012-05-31 | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-3 | |
2012-05-31 | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled | |
2012-05-29 | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 | |
2012-05-29 | Returned to Senate with amendments | |
2012-05-29 | Senate amendment amended | |
2012-05-23 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments | |
2012-05-22 | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0 | |
2012-05-22 | Read second time | |
2012-05-22 | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted | |
2012-05-16 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education | |
2012-05-16 | Polled out of committee Education | |
2012-05-01 | Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-05-01 | Introduced and read first time | |
2012-04-26 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2012-04-25 | Roll call Yeas-80 Nays-25 | |
2012-04-25 | Read second time | |
2012-04-25 | Amended | |
2012-04-25 | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Stavrinakis | |
2012-04-24 | Requests for debate-Rep | |
2012-03-29 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works | |
2012-03-21 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works | |
2012-03-21 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S1323 (Similar To) 2012-03-07 - Referred to Committee on Education