SC H5050 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revise The Filing Period For Statements Of Intention Of Candidacy For Districts 51 And 52 And To Correct Outdated References To The County Election Commission.
Title
Greenwood School District 51 and Ninety-Six School District 52, board of trustees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-09 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2018-03-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0 |
2018-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-08 | House | Amended |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |