SC H5040 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Intersection Located At The Junction Of Lady Street And Millwood Avenue In The City Of Columbia "reverend Blakely N. Scott Intersection" And Erect Appropriate Signs Or Markers At This Intersection Containing These Words.
Title
Reverend Blakely N. Scott Intersection; Richland County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-02-20 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced |