SC H5016 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 11-7-70 So As To Provide That The Governor Shall Appoint The State Auditor With The Advice And Consent Of The Senate; By Amending Section 1-3-240, Relating To Removal Of Officers By The Governor, So As To Add The State Auditor; And By Repealing Section 11-7-10 Relating To The Selection Of The State Auditor.
Title
State Auditor
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Newton [R] | Rep. Christopher Murphy [R] | Rep. Micajah Caskey [R] | Rep. Cody Mitchell [R] |
Rep. Richard Yow [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-29 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2024-03-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0 |
2024-03-28 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2024-03-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mitchell, Yow |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 3 | 240 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 7 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 7 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |