SC H4948 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - Committed to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - Committed to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allow The Governor To Appoint The Secretary Of Transportation Until July 1, 2016; And To Delete Paragraph 84.18, Part 1b, Act 91 Of 2015, Relating To The Appointment Of The Secretary Of Transportation.
Title
Secretary of Transportation
Sponsors
Rep. James Lucas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | Committed to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-25 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-1-16 |
2016-02-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-02-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
H3579 (Similar To) 2016-05-26 - Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0
H3661 (Similar To) 2015-03-02 - Scrivener's error corrected
H4484 (Similar To) 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4635 (Similar To) 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3661 (Similar To) 2015-03-02 - Scrivener's error corrected
H4484 (Similar To) 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4635 (Similar To) 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary