SC H3661 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempt From Property Tax Forty-two And Seventy-five One Hundredths Percent Of The Fair Market Value Of Manufacturing Property, To Exempt From Property Tax Forty-two And Seventy-five One Hundredths Percent Of The Fair Market Value Of Business Personal Property Required To Be Reported And Returned Annually To The Department Of Revenue Or County Auditors, And To Phase In These Exemptions Over Four Years.
Title
Manufacturing property
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Pitts [R] | Rep. Brian White [R] | Sen. Dwight Loftis [R] | Rep. Norman Brannon [R] |
Rep. William Clyburn [D] | Rep. Deborah Long [R] | Rep. William Sandifer [R] | Rep. William Whitmire [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-02-18 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Sottile |
2015-02-17 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-02-17 | House | Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2015-02-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3579 (Similar To) 2016-05-26 - Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0
H4484 (Similar To) 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4635 (Similar To) 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4948 (Similar To) 2016-03-01 - Committed to Committee on Judiciary
H4484 (Similar To) 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4635 (Similar To) 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4948 (Similar To) 2016-03-01 - Committed to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 43 | 140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 43 | 180 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 43 | 265 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 28 | 2740 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 28 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 2110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 2647 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 37 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 11 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 11 | 450 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 730 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 740 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 95 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |