SC H3579 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 48-22)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increase The Size Of The Tax Brackets For Each Tax Rate; And To Amend Section 12-6-520, Relating To The Annual Adjustment Of Income Tax Brackets, So As Provide The Brackets Shall Not Be Adjusted In Tax Years 2016 And 2017.
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Bank
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - House - House: Granting Free Conference Powers (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Am. No 31 (Y: 24 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table An No. 29 (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table No. 28 (Y: 24 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Am. No. 17 (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Rule 15a (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Rule 15 A (Y: 6 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate: To Carry Over Motion To Vary Order Of The Day (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Senate: To Set For Special Order (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 87 N: 20 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: Waive Printing Of H. 3579 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Am. No 31 (Y: 24 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table An No. 29 (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table No. 28 (Y: 24 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Am. No. 17 (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Rule 15a (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Rule 15 A (Y: 6 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate: To Carry Over Motion To Vary Order Of The Day (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Senate: To Set For Special Order (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 87 N: 20 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: Waive Printing Of H. 3579 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0 |
2016-05-26 | House | Free conference committee appointed Simrill, White, Rutherford |
2016-05-26 | House | Free conference powers granted |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Hutto, Grooms, Cleary |
2016-04-20 | House | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Simrill, White, Rutherford |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-0 Nays-39 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2016-04-13 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2016-04-13 | House | Amended |
2016-03-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-30 Nays-15 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Amended |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Special order, set for May 12, 2015 |
2015-04-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Motion For Special Order Failed |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Finance |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-04-16 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Roll call Yeas-87 Nays-20 |
2015-04-15 | House | Read second time |
2015-04-15 | House | Amended |
2015-04-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Anderson |
2015-04-15 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2015-03-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons, Duckworth, Johnson, George, Alexander |
2015-03-04 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Kirby, Stavrinakis |
2015-03-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Corley |
2015-03-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-02-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brannon |
2015-02-18 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Tinkler, Hicks |
2015-02-17 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Duckworth, Hardee |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3661 (Similar To) 2015-03-02 - Scrivener's error corrected
H4484 (Similar To) 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4635 (Similar To) 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4948 (Similar To) 2016-03-01 - Committed to Committee on Judiciary
H4484 (Similar To) 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4635 (Similar To) 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4948 (Similar To) 2016-03-01 - Committed to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 43 | 140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 43 | 180 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 43 | 265 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 28 | 2740 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 28 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 2110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 2647 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 6 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 6 | 520 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 11 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 11 | 450 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 4210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 4220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 730 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 740 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 95 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |