SC H4928 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Act No. 151
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Act No. 151
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 25-21-10, Relating To The Establishment Of The Veterans' Trust Fund, So As To Provide For Fundraising; And By Amending Section 25-21-30, Relating To The Duties And Functions Of The Veterans' Trust Fund Board Of Trustees, So As To Provide For The Ability To Fundraise. - Ratified Title
Title
Veterans' Trust Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Sylleste Davis [R] | Rep. Bobby Cox [R] | Rep. Christopher Hart [D] | Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D] |
Rep. JA Moore [D] | Rep. Micajah Caskey [R] | Rep. Robert Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Act No. 151 | |
2024-05-30 | Effective date 05/13/24 | |
2024-05-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-05-08 | Ratified R 167 | |
2024-04-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-0 |
2024-04-10 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Family and Veterans' Services |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-02-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-114 Nays-0 |
2024-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey, Williams |
2024-02-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hart, Jefferson, J.Moore |
2024-01-31 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2024-01-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.J.Cox |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |