SC H4711 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-8)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Requests for debate-Rep
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Requests for debate-Rep
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 44-53-361 So As To Require Prescribers To Offer A Prescription For Naloxone To A Patient Under Certain Circumstances And For Other Purposes.
Title
Naloxone
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2020-02-26 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-27-20 |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2020-02-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hewitt, Pendarvis, Oremus, McKnight, Huggins, Wooten, Bennett, Bales, McCravy, Ridgeway, Mack, Bailey, Johnson, Elliott, Dillard, Trantham, G.R.Smith, B.Newton, Mace, Hosey, Anderson, Taylor, Ligon, Erickson |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-11-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2019-11-20 | House | Prefiled |