SC H4438 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campbell (ch), Cleary, Williams, Mulvaney, Nicholson
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campbell (ch), Cleary, Williams, Mulvaney, Nicholson
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND SECTION 32-8-320, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO PERSONS WHO MAY SERVE AS A DECEDENT'S AGENT TO AUTHORIZE CREMATION, SO AS TO ALSO PERMIT A PERSON NAMED IN THE DECEDENT'S UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE RECORD OF EMERGENCY DATA (DD FORM 93) OR ITS SUCCESSOR FORM, IF THE DECEDENT DIED WHILE SERVING IN ANY BRANCH OF THE UNITED STATES ARMED SERVICES AS DEFINED IN 10 U.S.C. SECTION 1481 AND COMPLETED SUCH FORM.
Title
Also Permit A Person Named In The Decedent's United States Department Of Defense Record Of Emergency Data (dd Form 93) Or Its Successor Form, If The Decedent Died While Serving In Any Branch Of The United States Armed Services As Defined In 10 U.s.c. Section 1481 And Completed Such Form.
Sponsors
Rep. James Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Referred to Subcommittee: Campbell (ch), Cleary, Williams, Mulvaney, Nicholson | |
2010-04-21 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-7 | |
2010-04-21 | Introduced and read first time SJ-7 | |
2010-04-21 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-10 | |
2010-04-20 | Read second time HJ-58 | |
2010-04-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-04-14 | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary HJ-1 | |
2010-01-27 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-30 | |
2010-01-27 | Introduced and read first time HJ-30 |
Same As/Similar To
S1028 (Similar To) 2010-06-17 - Act No. 221
H4706 (Similar To) 2010-03-09 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-6
H4706 (Similar To) 2010-03-09 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-6
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4438&session=118 |