SC H4266 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Act No. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Act No. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide For The Continuing Authority To Pay The Expenses Of State Government If The 2015-2016 Fiscal Year Begins Without A General Appropriations Act For That Year In Effect, To Suspend A Provision, And To Provide For The Duration Of The Continuing Authority
Title
Continuing authority to pay expenses of state government
Sponsors
Rep. James Lucas [R] | Rep. Brian White [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - House: Adoption Of Joint Resolution (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - House: Adoption Of Joint Resolution (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-17 | Act No. 94 | |
2015-07-06 | Effective date 07/01/15 | |
2015-06-24 | Signed By Governor | |
2015-06-23 | Ratified R 131 | |
2015-06-17 | House | Roll call Yeas-89 Nays-10 |
2015-06-17 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-2 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Amended |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Finance |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-05-29 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-05-28 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2015-05-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2015-05-28 | House | Read second time |
2015-05-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-05-27 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |