SC H4230 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-31 - Act No. 92
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-31 - Act No. 92
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Make Supplemental Appropriations For Fiscal Year 2015-2016, And To Provide For Other Related Matters
Title
Supplemental appropriations
Sponsors
Rep. Brian White [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-07 - House - House: Override Veto 1 (Y: 0 N: 106 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2015-06-23 - House - House: Adoption Of Conference Report (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House: Adopt Motions To Non-concur (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House: Adoption Of Conference Report (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House: Adopt Motions To Non-concur (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-31 | Act No. 92 | |
2015-07-22 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2015-07-07 | House | Veto sustained on certain items: 1 |
2015-06-29 | Certain items vetoed by Governor | |
2015-06-23 | Ratified R 130 | |
2015-06-23 | House | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Conference report adopted |
2015-06-23 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0 |
2015-06-23 | House | Conference report adopted |
2015-06-19 | House | Conference committee appointed White, Pitts, Clyburn |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Leatherman, Setzler, Peeler |
2015-06-19 | House | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2015-06-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-1 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-06-17 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-06-17 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-0 |
2015-06-17 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2015-06-16 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2015-06-16 | House | Read second time |
2015-06-16 | House | Amended |
2015-06-04 | House | Debate adjourned |
2015-06-02 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2015-05-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-05-26 | House | Introduced and read first time |