SC H4218 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of South Carolina Highway 9 In The City Of Chester In Chester County From Its Intersection With Hudson Street To Its Intersection With Cemetery Street "christopher King, Sr. Memorial Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway Containing These Words.
Title
Mr. Christopher King Jr. - HCR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-05-06 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-04-15 | House | Introduced |