SC H4043 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Alter The Membership Of The Commission And To Require The Commission To Release A List Of All Qualified Candidates To The General Assembly Rather Than Nominating Candidates.
Title
Election of judges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0096 (Similar To) 2017-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3184 (Similar To) 2017-01-18 - Member
H3204 (Similar To) 2017-03-22 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
H3206 (Similar To) 2017-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer, Putnam
H3184 (Similar To) 2017-01-18 - Member
H3204 (Similar To) 2017-03-22 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
H3206 (Similar To) 2017-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer, Putnam
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 19 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4043&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4043_20170322.htm |