SC H3206 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer, Putnam
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Add That Assault And Battery Of A High And Aggravated Nature Occurs When A Person Injures A Federal, State, Or Local Law Enforcement Officer Or Corrections Officer In The Discharge Of Or Because Of Their Official Duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assault and Battery

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer, Putnam
2017-02-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson
2017-01-18HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Duckworth, Johnson, Jordan, Hewitt, Crosby
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-10HouseIntroduced and read first time
2016-12-15HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-12-15HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0096 (Similar To) 2017-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3184 (Similar To) 2017-01-18 - Member
H3204 (Similar To) 2017-03-22 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
H4043 (Similar To) 2017-03-22 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
163600(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback