SC H3204 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Change The Commission's Process For Nominating Judicial Candidates From The Nomination Of Three Qualified Candidates To The Release Of A List Of All Qualified Candidates To The General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judicial Merit Selection Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-22HouseRecommitted to Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-09HouseDebate adjourned until Mon., 3-13-17
2017-03-07HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 3-8-17
2017-03-02HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 3-7-17
2017-03-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer, Putnam
2017-03-01HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 3-2-17
2017-02-28HouseDebate adjourned until We., 3-1-17
2017-02-23HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 2-28-17
2017-02-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bedingfield
2017-02-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson
2017-02-01HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2017-02-01HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis
2017-01-31HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 2-1-17
2017-01-31HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton
2017-01-26 Scrivener's error corrected
2017-01-25HouseCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2017-01-19HouseMember
2017-01-18HouseMember
2017-01-12HouseMember
2017-01-11HouseMember
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-10HouseIntroduced and read first time
2016-12-15HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-12-15HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0096 (Similar To) 2017-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3184 (Similar To) 2017-01-18 - Member
H3206 (Similar To) 2017-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer, Putnam
H4043 (Similar To) 2017-03-22 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21910(n/a)See Bill Text
21920(n/a)See Bill Text
21935(n/a)See Bill Text
21970(n/a)See Bill Text
21980(n/a)See Bill Text
21990(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback