SC H3963 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 50-9-920, Relating To Revenue From The Sale Of Individual Antlered Deer Tags, So As To Utilize The Revenue For The Coyote And Hog Management Program.
Title
Hunting licenses
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Nutt [R] | Rep. Gary Brewer [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-02-29 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2024-02-29 | House | Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-0 |
2024-02-29 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-29 | House | Amended |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2024-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brewer |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced and read first time |