SC H3864 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revise The Age, Weight, And Position Of A Child Who Must Be Secured In A Child Passenger Restraint System, To Provide Exceptions When Medically Necessary, And To Include Temporary Living Quarters In Recreational Vehicles As Being Considered Rear Passenger Seats

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child passenger restraint

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 75 N: 28 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31 Act No. 78
2017-05-25 Effective date 5/19/17
2017-05-19 Signed By Governor
2017-05-15 Ratified R 115
2017-05-10HouseRoll call Yeas-70 Nays-24
2017-05-10HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2017-05-10SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2017-05-09SenateRoll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
2017-05-09SenateRead second time
2017-05-09SenateAmended
2017-05-02SenateRecalled from Committee on Transportation
2017-04-05SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-04-05SenateIntroduced and read first time
2017-04-05HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2017-04-04HouseRoll call Yeas-75 Nays-28
2017-04-04HouseRead second time
2017-04-04HouseAmended
2017-04-04HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2017-03-29HouseCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2017-03-22HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: King, Elliott
2017-02-28HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-28HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5656410(n/a)See Bill Text
5656420(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback