SC H3623 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Referred to Committee on Corrections and Penology
Pending: Senate Corrections and Penology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 24-13-150, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Early Release Of An Inmate, So As To Reduce The Percentage Of Time An Inmate Who Has Committed A "no Parole Offense" Must Serve Before He May Become Eligible For Early Release, Discharge, Or Community Supervision From Eighty-five Percent To Sixty-five Percent For Certain Drug Offenses, And To Provide This Reduction Applies To Inmates Currently Incarcerated Under Certain Circumstances; To Amend Section 44-53-370, Relating To The Unlawful Possession, Manufacture, And Trafficking Of Controlled Substances, So As To Revise The Penalties And Weight Presumptions, And Eliminate Mandatory Minimum Sentences; And To Amend Section 44-53-375, Relating To The Unlawful Possession, Manufacture, And Trafficking Of Methamphetamine, Cocaine Base, Or Other Controlled Substances, So As To Revise The Penalties And Weight Presumptions, And Eliminate Mandatory Minimum Sentences.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early release of an inmate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 62 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29SenateReferred to Committee on Corrections and Penology
2021-04-29SenateIntroduced and read first time
2021-04-29HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2021-04-28HouseRoll call Yeas-62 Nays-45
2021-04-28HouseRead second time
2021-04-28HouseAmended
2021-04-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Anderson, S.Williams, King, Alexander, McDaniel, Henderson-Myers, Govan
2021-04-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers, Brawley
2021-04-27HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2021-04-22HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams, Murray, Gilliard
2021-04-21HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0170 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Corrections and Penology
H3994 (Similar To) 2021-03-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2413150(n/a)See Bill Text
4453370(n/a)See Bill Text
4453375(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback