SC H3994 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 24-13-150, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Early Release Of An Inmate, So As To Reduce The Percentage Of Time An Inmate Who Has Committed A "no Parole Offense" Must Serve Before He May Become Eligible For Early Release, Discharge, Or Community Supervision From Eighty-five Percent To Sixty-five Percent For Certain Drug Offenses, And To Provide This Reduction Applies To Inmates Currently Incarcerated Under Certain Circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early release of and inmate

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill
2021-03-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson
2021-03-02HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0170 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Corrections and Penology
H3623 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2413150(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback