SC S0170 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Corrections and Penology
Pending: Senate Corrections and Penology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 24-13-150, 24-13-210, And 24-13-230, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, All Relating To The Early Release, Discharge, Community Supervision, Forfeiture Of Credits, Credits For Good Behavior, And Reduction In A Sentence For Certain Inmates, So As To Provide For A Reduction In The Sentence Of An Inmate Convicted Of Certain "no Parole Offenses" Upon Satisfying Certain Conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentencing, reduction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Corrections and Penology
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Corrections and Penology
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3623 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Referred to Committee on Corrections and Penology
H3994 (Similar To) 2021-03-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2413150(n/a)See Bill Text
2413210(n/a)See Bill Text
2413230(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback