SC H3598 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
Pending: Senate Family and Veterans Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
Pending: Senate Family and Veterans Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 25-11-85 So As To Establish The "veterans Service Organization Burial Honor Guard Support Fund" To Help Offset The Costs Incurred By South Carolina Chapters Of Congressionally Chartered Veterans Service Organizations In Providing Honor Guard Burial Details At The Funerals Of Qualifying South Carolina Military Veterans, And To Define Relevant Terms.
Title
Veterans Service Organization Burial Honor Guard
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-02-23 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2022-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan, Govan |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2022-02-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Blackwell, Oremus, Taylor, Hixon, Forrest |
2022-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Matthews |
2022-02-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones |
2022-01-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton |
2022-01-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow |
2022-01-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter |
2021-12-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley, King, Gilliard, Jefferson, Howard, S.Williams |
2021-01-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: May, Dabney |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0968 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Act No. 225