SC H3581 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-21 - Act No. 87
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-21 - Act No. 87
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION TO PROVIDE THAT THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 6-27-50, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO RESTRICTIONS ON AMENDING OR REPEALING PROVISIONS IN THE STATE AID TO SUBDIVISIONS ACT ARE SUSPENDED FOR FISCAL YEAR 2009-2010, AND TO PROVIDE THAT FOR FISCAL YEARS 2008-2009 AND 2009-2010 COUNTIES MAY TRANSFER AMONG APPROPRIATED STATE REVENUES AS NEEDED TO ENSURE THE DELIVERY OF SERVICES. - ratified title
Title
Provide That The Provisions Of Section 6-27-50, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Restrictions On Amending Or Repealing Provisions In The State Aid To Subdivisions Act Are Suspended For Fiscal Year 2009-2010, And To Provide That For Fiscal Years 2008-2009 And 2009-2010 Counties May Transfer Among Appropriated State Revenues As Needed To Ensure The Delivery Of Services. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-21 | Act No. 87 | |
2009-05-21 | Effective date 05/19/09 | |
2009-05-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2009-05-13 | Ratified R 50 | |
2009-04-30 | Read third time and enrolled SJ-24 | |
2009-04-23 | Read second time SJ-39 | |
2009-04-21 | Committee report: Favorable Finance SJ-13 | |
2009-03-10 | Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-15 | |
2009-03-10 | Introduced and read first time SJ-15 | |
2009-03-06 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-2 | |
2009-03-05 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day HJ-92 | |
2009-03-05 | Roll call Yeas-65 Nays-40 HJ-91 | |
2009-03-05 | Read second time HJ-91 | |
2009-03-05 | Amended HJ-28 | |
2009-03-05 | Requests for debate-Rep(s). Ott, JE Smith, JH Neal, Hodges, Gunn, Sellers, Vick, Cooper, Kennedy, Harvin, Weeks, Cato, Funderburk, Clemmons, Agnew, Duncan, MA Pitts, White, McEachern, R Brown, Allison, Parker, Loftis, HB Brown, Mack, Anderson, Erickson, B | |
2009-03-03 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means HJ-2 | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-6 | |
2009-02-19 | Introduced and read first time HJ-6 |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3581&session=118 |