SC H3417 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Act No. 178
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Act No. 178
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Clarify That The Provision Of Fire Protection Services May Or May Not Include Rescue Response Services As An Authorized Purpose For Which A Special Purpose Or Public Service District May Be Established
Title
Special purpose districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Act No. 178 | |
2012-05-31 | Effective date 05/25/12 | |
2012-05-25 | Signed By Governor | |
2012-05-23 | Ratified R 206 | |
2012-05-17 | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-2 | |
2012-05-17 | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled | |
2012-05-09 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments | |
2012-04-26 | Roll call Ayes-32 Nays-1 | |
2012-04-26 | Read second time | |
2012-04-26 | Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2012-04-25 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Subcommittee: Cleary (ch), Ford, S.Martin | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-02-23 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2011-02-22 | Read second time | |
2011-02-22 | Amended | |
2011-02-16 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-25 | Introduced and read first time |