SC H3308 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Recommitted to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Recommitted to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 59-21-720, Relating To Certification Of School Psychologists By The State Department Of Education, So As To Provide That In Determining Eligibility For Certification, The Department May Accept The Credentials Of School Psychologists, Social Workers, And School Guidance Counselors Certified In Other States To Serve As School Psychologists In This State Upon Demonstrating Compliance With Credentialing Requirements Of This State, And To Provide For The Issuance Of Temporary Certification For Applicants Who Need To Meet These Requirements.
Title
School psychologists
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Gilliam [R] | Rep. John Mccravy [R] | Rep. Raye Felder [R] | Rep. Shannon Erickson [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2023-03-08 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-28-23 |
2023-03-07 | House | Debate adjourned |
2023-03-01 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2023-02-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Bradley |
2023-02-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-12-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2022-12-08 | House | Prefiled |