SC H3305 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 59-63-100 So As To Provide Public Schools May Not Contract With Private Entities For The Supervision, Sanctioning, Or Regulation Of Interscholastic Competitions Unless The Entity Requires Member Charter Schools And Private Schools To Participate At Higher Classification Levels Of Competition If They Accept Students Living Outside Of The Public High School Attendance Zone In Which The They Are Located.
Title
Student Athletes
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Gagnon [R] | Rep. Frank Atkinson [D] | Rep. Richard Yow [R] | Rep. Bill Taylor [R] |
Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D] | Rep. Phillip Lowe [R] | Rep. Cally Forrest [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest |
2023-03-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Lowe |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-12-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2022-12-08 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0333 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Education
H3871 (Similar To) 2023-03-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Lawson
H3871 (Similar To) 2023-03-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Lawson