SC H3871 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Lawson
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Lawson
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 59-63-100, Relating To Participation In Public School District Interscholastic Competitions By Charter School Students And Private School Students, Among Others, So As To Provide Public Schools May Not Contract With Private Entities For The Supervision, Sanctioning, Or Regulation Of Interscholastic Competitions Unless The Entity Requires Member Charter Schools And Private Schools To Participate At Higher Classification Levels Of Competition If They Accept Students Living Outside Of The Public High School Attendance Zone In Which The They Are Located, And To Provide Modified Requirements For Schools Already Competing At The Second Highest Level Or Highest Level Of Competition.
Title
Student Athletes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Lawson |
2023-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gagnon, Forrest, Williams |
2023-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2023-02-02 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0333 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Education
H3305 (Similar To) 2023-03-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest
H3305 (Similar To) 2023-03-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest