SC H3291 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Act No. 219
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Act No. 219
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 16-11-600, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Trespassing And The Posting Of Notice Of Trespassing, So As To Allow For A Different Method Of The Posting Of Notice Of Trespassing Involving Clearly Visible Purple-painted Boundaries. - Ratified Title
Title
Trespassing
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Pope [R] | Rep. James Burns [R] | Rep. William Chumley [R] | Rep. Bruce Bryant [R] |
Rep. Steve Moss [R] | Rep. Patrick Haddon [R] | Rep. Cally Forrest [R] | Rep. Randy Ligon [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Act No. 219 | |
2022-06-01 | Effective date 05/23/22 | |
2022-05-23 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-05-18 | Ratified R 247 | |
2022-05-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-1 |
2022-05-12 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-1 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2022-05-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Amended |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Hutto, Matthews, Climer, Senn, Cash, Harpootlian |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Climer (ch), Kimpson, Matthews, Adams, Kimbrell |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-17 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-2 |
2021-03-16 | House | Read second time |
2021-03-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ligon |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-27 | House | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |